WI AB506 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 165.85 (3) (cm); to amend 165.85 (2) (bv), 165.85 (2) (c), 165.85 (3) (a) and 165.85 (3) (b); and to create 165.85 (2) (ap), 165.85 (2) (be), 165.85 (2) (fm), 165.85 (3) (am), 165.85 (3) (cm) 6. and 165.85 (4) (em) of the statutes; Relating to: the responsibilities of the Law Enforcement Standards Board.
Title
The responsibilities of the Law Enforcement Standards Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-01-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2017-11-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-11-17 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2017-11-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott |
2017-09-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-09-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab506 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB506.pdf |