WI AB506 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: grant funding for services for Syrian refugees. (FE)
Title
Grant funding for services for Syrian refugees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-16 | House | Representative T. Larson withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-11-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2015-11-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab506 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB506.pdf |