WI AB506 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 236.12 (4), 236.12 (5), 236.20 (1) (b), 443.01 (4), 443.06 (2) (a), 443.06 (2) (b), 443.06 (2) (c), 443.06 (2) (e), 443.06 (2) (em), 443.06 (3), 443.14 (8) (b) and 443.14 (8) (c); to renumber and amend 60.84 (1), 236.11 (2), 236.12 (8), 236.15 (1) (intro.), 236.15 (1) (a), 236.21 (1) (b) and 236.32 (except 236.32 (title)); to consolidate, renumber and amend 236.12 (2) (intro.) and (a) and 236.12 (3) and (6); to amend 15.405 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b), 20.165 (2) (j), 26.09 (3) (b) 1., 30.11 (3), 30.13 (3) (a), 59.20 (2) (c), 59.43 (8), 59.45 (1) (a) 2., 59.45 (1) (b), 59.45 (3), 59.46, 59.72 (3m) (a) 4m., 59.73 (2), 59.74 (2) (b) 1., 59.74 (2) (c), 59.74 (2) (g), 59.74 (2) (h), 59.74 (2) (j), 59.75, 60.84 (2), 60.84 (3) (a), 60.84 (3) (c) (intro.) and 1., 60.84 (4), 66.0309 (11), 70.27 (2), 70.27 (5), 70.27 (6), 70.27 (7) (intro.), 70.27 (7) (d), 84.095 (5), 157.07 (1), 157.07 (2), 157.07 (3), 236.02 (2m), 236.03 (2), 236.12 (2) (b), 236.13 (2) (a), 236.13 (2m), 236.15 (1) (b), 236.15 (1) (d), 236.15 (2), 236.16 (3) (title), 236.16 (3) (a), 236.16 (3) (b), 236.16 (4), 236.20 (1) (a), 236.20 (2) (g), 236.20 (2) (k), 236.20 (3) (b), 236.20 (4) (b), 236.20 (5) (c), 236.21 (1) (intro.), 236.21 (1) (a), 236.21 (1) (d), 236.25 (2) (a), 236.25 (2) (c), 236.25 (2) (d), 236.34 (1) (a), 236.34 (1) (b), 236.34 (1) (c), 236.34 (1) (d) (intro.), 236.34 (1) (d) 1., 236.34 (1) (d) 2., 236.34 (1) (d) 4., 236.34 (1) (e), 236.34 (2) (b) 1., 293.37 (2) (a), 295.48 (1) (intro.), 440.03 (13) (b) 34., 440.08 (2) (a) 39., chapter 443 (title), 443.01 (3), 443.01 (3r) (c), 443.02 (4), 443.06 (title), 443.06 (1) (title), 443.06 (1) (a), 443.06 (1) (b), 443.06 (2) (intro.), 443.06 (2) (am), 443.06 (2) (bm), 443.06 (2) (cm), 443.06 (2) (d), 443.10 (title), 443.10 (2) (b), 443.10 (5), 443.12 (title), 443.12 (1), 443.12 (2), 443.12 (3), 443.12 (4), 443.14 (8) (a), 443.14 (8) (d), 443.14 (11), 443.18 (2) (b), 470.025 (7), 703.02 (6m), 703.11 (2) (intro.), 703.11 (2) (b), 703.11 (4), 703.115 (1) (b), 703.13 (6) (e), 703.13 (7) (c), 703.13 (8) (c), 707.215 (2) (intro.), 707.215 (3), 707.215 (5) (intro.), 709.02 (1), 709.07 and 893.37; to create 59.001 (3r), 60.84 (1g), 60.84 (3) (c) 3., 157.061 (13m), 236.02 (9b), 236.025, 236.11 (2) (b), 236.12 (2) (ac), 236.20 (6), 236.32 (2m), 236.34 (4), 443.01 (1m), 443.01 (3b), 443.01 (6s), 443.01 (7m), 443.134, 443.135, 703.02 (13r) and 710.09 of the statutes; and to affect 2009 Wisconsin Act 376, section 13 (1); Relating to: professional land surveyors; the practice of professional land surveying; surveying land abutting navigable waters; various changes regarding platting, surveying, and certified survey maps; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Professional land surveyors; the practice of professional land surveying; surveying land abutting navigable waters; various changes regarding platting, surveying, and certified survey maps; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] |
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Timothy Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 358 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | LRB correction |
2014-03-26 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3) |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 5 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 5 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-01-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2014-01-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2014-01-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2013-12-12 | House | Representative Kooyenga withdrawn as a coauthor |
2013-12-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-12-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2013-12-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2013-12-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-15 | House | Representative Brooks withdrawn as a coauthor |
2013-11-14 | House | Representative Czaja withdrawn as a coauthor |
2013-11-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2013-11-12 | House | Introduced |