WI AB505 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 973.095 of the statutes; relating to: participating in a veterans court program. (FE)
Title
Participating in a veterans court program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2012-01-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab505 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB505.pdf |