WI AB504 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 77.70 (2) of the statutes; relating to: a Milwaukee County sales and use tax for parks, recreation, and culture.
Title
A Milwaukee County sales and use tax for parks, recreation, and culture.
Sponsors
Rep. Tamara Grigsby [D] | Rep. Frederick Kessler [D] | Rep. Jon Richards [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] |
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Barbara Toles [D] | Rep. Leon Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2010-01-25 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 6, Noes 4 | |
2010-01-25 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 6, Noes 4 | |
2010-01-12 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-12 | Representative Zepnick added as a coauthor of Assembly substitute amendment 1 | |
2010-01-11 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Richards | |
2010-01-11 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Richards | |
2010-01-11 | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Richards | |
2009-12-08 | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Richards | |
2009-12-08 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representatives Zepnick, Sinicki and Richards | |
2009-12-02 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Richards | |
2009-12-02 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Richards | |
2009-11-13 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-12 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-15 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab504 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB504.pdf |