WI AB503 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 948.10 (1); to amend 973.047 (1f); and to create 948.10 (1) (a) of the statutes; relating to: exposure to a minor and providing a penalty.
Title
Exposure to a minor and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Published 5-5-2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Report approved by the Governor on 4-21-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 202 | |
2010-04-20 | Presented to the Governor on 4-20-2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-08 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-03-04 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-04 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-02-17 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-16 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 2 adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Turner, Kleefisch and Staskunas | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author | |
2010-02-16 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on calendar 2-16-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Report of joint review committee on Criminal Penalties requested pursuant to s. 13.525 (5)(b) Wisconsin Statutes | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-12 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-10 | Executive action taken | |
2009-12-10 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Staskunas and Kleefisch | |
2009-11-12 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-12 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-30 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-29 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-28 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice | |
2009-10-15 | Introduced |