WI AB502 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 100.43 (2); and to create 100.43 (1) (gm), 100.43 (1) (k) and 100.43 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of liquid nicotine packaging, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulation of liquid nicotine packaging, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kerkman and C. Taylor |
2016-01-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2015-11-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab502 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB502.pdf |