WI AB502 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (5) (br) of the statutes; relating to: requiring the Department of Revenue to certify the tax base of Tax Incremental Financing District Number 18 in the city of Waukesha.
Title
Requiring the Department of Revenue to certify the tax base of Tax Incremental Financing District Number 18 in the city of Waukesha.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2010-01-26 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-01-26 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-26 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-01-26 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-26 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-26 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Calendar | |
2010-01-22 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-22 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-20 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl | |
2009-11-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-15 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab502 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB502.pdf |