WI AB5 | 2011 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Published 3-8-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Published 3-8-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 13.085 of the statutes; relating to: requiring a supermajority for passage of tax increase legislation.
Title
Requiring a supermajority for passage of tax increase legislation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Published 3-8-2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-22-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 9 | |
2011-02-15 | Presented to the Governor on 2-15-2011 | |
2011-02-10 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2011-02-08 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2011-02-08 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-02-08 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 | |
2011-02-08 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-08 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2011-02-08 | Point of order that Senate amendment 5 not germane well taken | |
2011-02-08 | Senate amendment 5 offered by Senator Carpenter | |
2011-02-08 | Senate amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate amendment 4 offered by Senator Erpenbach | |
2011-02-08 | Senate amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 13 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 22, Noes 10 | |
2011-02-08 | Read a second time | |
2011-02-08 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up | |
2011-02-07 | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senator Carpenter | |
2011-02-07 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Carpenter | |
2011-02-07 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter | |
2011-02-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2011-02-07 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2011-01-26 | Available for scheduling | |
2011-01-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2011-01-26 | Received from Assembly | |
2011-01-25 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-01-25 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 57, Noes 36, Paired 2 | |
2011-01-25 | Rules suspended | |
2011-01-25 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 38 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representatives Turner and Barca | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 38 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representatives Barca and Seidel | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 37 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Grigsby, Toles, Molepske Jr, Pasch, Mason, Bernard Schaber, Pope-Roberts, Fields and Sinicki | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 37 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Steinbrink, Staskunas, Jorgensen and Hulsey | |
2011-01-25 | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 1-25-2011 | |
2011-01-25 | Read a second time | |
2011-01-20 | Placed on calendar 1-25-2011 by committee on Rules | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2011-01-20 | Report passage recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 7, Noes 4 | |
2011-01-20 | Executive action taken | |
2011-01-19 | Public hearing held | |
2011-01-04 | Senator Vukmir added as a cosponsor | |
2011-01-04 | Representative August added as a coauthor | |
2011-01-04 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced |