WI AB494 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 19.56 (3) (f) and 19.59 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing local public officials to receive anything of value that the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation or the Department of Tourism is authorized to provide.
Title
Allowing local public officials to receive anything of value that the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation or the Department of Tourism is authorized to provide.
Sponsors
Rep. Tyler August [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | House | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 112 |
2017-11-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-09-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-09-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-09-13 | House | Introduced |