WI AB494 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (9e) (aj) (intro.), 71.08 (1) (intro.) and 71.10 (4) (i); and to create 20.835 (2) (cb), 71.07 (9e) (ak) and 71.07 (9g) of the statutes; Relating to: creating an additional refundable earned income tax credit for individuals and changing the eligibility for, and the percentages that may be claimed by eligible claimants under, the earned income tax credit. (FE)
Title
Creating an additional refundable earned income tax credit for individuals and changing the eligibility for, and the percentages that may be claimed by eligible claimants under, the earned income tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zepnick |
2015-11-19 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2015-11-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-11-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab494 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB494.pdf |