WI AB494 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 11.21 (16) of the statutes; relating to: the methodology for filing campaign finance reports in electronic format.
Title
The methodology for filing campaign finance reports in electronic format.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-22 | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted) | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on calendar 4-22-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-03-05 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-05 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-05 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2010-03-05 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2010-01-26 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-01-26 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-26 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-01-26 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-26 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-26 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on calendar 1-26-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2009-12-18 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-12-18 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Elections and Campaign Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-18 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Elections and Campaign Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-15 | Executive action taken | |
2009-12-11 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Mason | |
2009-11-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-13 | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Campaign Reform | |
2009-10-13 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab494 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB494.pdf |