WI AB490 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 29.563 (2g) (a) to (d); to renumber and amend 29.563 (2g) (intro.); to amend 29.563 (2) (intro.), 29.563 (12m) and 29.563 (14) (c) 1.; and to create 29.563 (2g) (bm) and 59.563 (6r) of the statutes; Relating to: resident deer hunting license, archer hunting license, and crossbow hunting license fees imposed for a veteran who is 70 years of age or older. (FE)
Title
Resident deer hunting license, archer hunting license, and crossbow hunting license fees imposed for a veteran who is 70 years of age or older. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-10-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2017-10-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-09-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab490 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB490.pdf |