WI AB490 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 79.04 (1) (a), 79.04 (2) (a), 79.04 (6) (a) and 79.04 (6) (c) 1.; and to create 79.04 (1) (d) and 79.04 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: utility aid payments to towns and counties for production plants that generate electricity from wind power. (FE)
Title
Utility aid payments to towns and counties for production plants that generate electricity from wind power. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2015-11-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab490 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB490.pdf |