WI AB490 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 46.27 (7g) (a) 5. b., 49.45 (4m) (a) 3. b., 49.45 (4m) (a) 3. d., 49.45 (4m) (a) 3. e., 49.453 (4c) (c), 49.496 (1) (cm) 2., 49.4962, 49.682 (1) (e) 2., 49.848, 49.849 (1) (d) 2., 59.43 (1) (w), 701.01, 701.02, 701.03, 701.04, 701.05, 701.06 (title), (1), (2), (3) and (6) (title) and (a), 701.065 (5), 701.07, 701.09 (3), (4) and (5), 701.10, 701.105 (4), 701.11, 701.115, 701.12, 701.13, 701.14 (title) and (1), 701.14 (4), 701.15, 701.16 (title), (1), (2), (3), (4) (title) and (a) to (c), (5) and (6), 701.17, 701.18, 701.19, 701.20 (title), 701.20 (2) (intro.), 701.20 (2) (i), 701.20 (2) (L), (m) and (n), 701.20 (4c) (b) 3. a., b. and c., 701.20 (4g) (a) 1. c., 701.20 (18) (a), 701.20 (21) (title), 701.20 (29) (c) 2. b., 701.20 (29) (d), 701.20 (31), 701.22 (title), 701.23, 701.24 (3), 701.26, 702.01 (6) and 881.05; to renumber 46.27 (7g) (a) 5. a., 49.496 (1) (cm) 1., 49.682 (1) (e) 1., 49.849 (1) (d) 1., 445.125 (4), 701.06 (6) (d), 701.09 (title), (1) and (2), 701.20 (2) (a), 701.20 (2) (c), 701.20 (2) (e), 701.20 (2) (f), 701.20 (2) (g), 701.20 (2) (j), 701.20 (4c) (title), 701.20 (4c) (b) 1., 701.20 (4c) (b) 2., 701.20 (4g) (title), 701.20 (4g) (a) 1. a., 701.20 (4g) (a) 1. e., 701.20 (4g) (a) 2. b., 701.20 (4m) (title), 701.20 (4m) (b), 701.20 (4m) (d), 701.20 (18) (title), 701.20 (29) (title), 701.20 (29) (a), 701.20 (29) (b), 701.24 (title), 701.25 and 702.01 (intro.); to renumber and amend 49.849 (4) (c) 2., 701.06 (4), 701.06 (5) (intro.) and (a), 701.06 (5) (b), 701.06 (5) (c), 701.06 (5m), 701.06 (6) (b), 701.06 (6) (c), 701.06 (7), 701.06 (8), 701.065 (title), (1), (2), (3) and (4), 701.08, 701.105 (title), (1), (2) and (3), 701.14 (2), 701.14 (3), 701.16 (4) (d), 701.20 (2) (b), 701.20 (2) (d), 701.20 (2) (h), 701.20 (2) (k), 701.20 (3), 701.20 (4), 701.20 (4c) (b) (intro.), 701.20 (4c) (b) 3. (intro.), 701.20 (4c) (b) 4., 701.20 (4c) (c), 701.20 (4c) (d), 701.20 (4c) (e), 701.20 (4c) (f), 701.20 (4c) (g), 701.20 (4g) (a) (intro.), 701.20 (4g) (a) 1. (intro.), 701.20 (4g) (a) 1. b., 701.20 (4g) (a) 1. d., 701.20 (4g) (a) 2. (intro.), 701.20 (4g) (a) 2. a., 701.20 (4g) (b), (c), (d) and (e), 701.20 (4j), 701.20 (4k), 701.20 (4m) (a), 701.20 (4m) (am), 701.20 (4m) (c), 701.20 (5), 701.20 (6), 701.20 (7), 701.20 (8), 701.20 (9) (a), 701.20 (10), 701.20 (11), 701.20 (12), 701.20 (13), 701.20 (14), 701.20 (15), 701.20 (16), 701.20 (17), 701.20 (18) (b), 701.20 (18) (c) 1., 701.20 (18) (c) 2., 701.20 (18) (d), 701.20 (18) (e), 701.20 (19), 701.20 (20), 701.20 (21), 701.20 (22), 701.20 (23), 701.20 (24), 701.20 (25), 701.20 (26), 701.20 (27), 701.20 (28), 701.20 (29) (c) (intro.), 701.20 (29) (c) 1., 701.20 (30), 701.21, 701.22, 701.24 (1), 701.24 (2), 702.01 (1), 702.01 (2), 702.01 (3), 702.01 (4), 702.01 (5), 702.15 (3), 702.17 (3), 879.47, 881.01 (1) (a) and 881.01 (4); to consolidate, renumber and amend 701.20 (29) (c) 2. (intro.) and a.; to amend 20.435 (4) (im), 20.435 (4) (in), 20.435 (7) (im), 23.0918 (2), 25.70, 46.27 (7g) (c) 2m. b., 46.27 (7g) (c) 6m. b., 46.27 (7g) (g), 46.286 (7), 49.453 (2) (a) (intro.), 49.453 (2) (b) (intro.), 49.496 (3) (aj) 2., 49.496 (3) (dm) 2., 49.496 (6m), 49.682 (2) (bm) 2., 49.682 (2) (fm) 2., 49.682 (5), 49.849 (2) (c), 49.849 (7), 223.07 (3), 223.105 (1) (c), 445.125 (1) (a) 1., 445.125 (1) (a) 2., 700.16 (1) (c), 700.27 (1) (d), (2) (a) 2. and (b), (4) (e), (5) (b), (7) (a) and (8) (a), 702.03, 702.05, 702.07, 702.08, 702.09 (title), (1) and (3) (a), (b) and (c), 702.11, 702.13 (title), (1) (intro.), (a), (b) and (c) and (2), 702.15 (intro.), (1) and (2), 702.17 (1), (2) and (5), 702.21, 766.55 (2) (bm), 766.575 (1) (e), 840.01 (1), 853.17 (2), 853.32 (3), 853.61 (2) (a), 854.13 (1) (c), (2) (a) 2. and (d), (4) (e), (5) (b), (7) (a) and (10) (a) , 854.23 (5) (b), 859.18 (5) (a), 859.18 (5) (b), 861.015 (2), 861.11 (5) (b), 865.08 (6), 867.03 (2g) (a), 879.03 (2) (c), 881.01 (1) (b) and 893.33 (4r); to repeal and recreate 881.01 (1) (title); and to create 49.849 (4) (c) 2. a., 49.849 (4) (c) 2. b., 49.849 (4) (c) 2. c., 445.125 (4) (bn), subchapter I (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0101], 701.0101, 701.0102, 701.0103, 701.0104, 701.0105, 701.0106, 701.0107, 701.0108, 701.0109, 701.0110, 701.0111, subchapter II (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0201], 701.0201, 701.0202, 701.0203, 701.0204, subchapter III (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0301], 701.0301, 701.0302, 701.0303, 701.0304, 701.0305, subchapter IV (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0401], 701.0401, 701.0402, 701.0403, 701.0404, 701.0405, 701.0406, 701.0407, 701.0408, 701.0409, 701.0410, 701.0411, 701.0412, 701.0413, 701.0414, 701.0415, 701.0416, 701.0417, 701.0418, subchapter V (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0501], 701.0501, 701.0502, 701.0503 (title), 701.0504, 701.0505, 701.0506, 701.0507, subchapter VI (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0601], 701.0601, 701.0602, 701.0603, 701.0604, subchapter VII (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0701], 701.0701, 701.0702, 701.0703, 701.0704, 701.0705, 701.0706, 701.0707, 701.0708, 701.0709, 701.0710, subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0801], 701.0801, 701.0802, 701.0803, 701.0804, 701.0805, 701.0806, 701.0807, 701.0808, 701.0809, 701.0810, 701.0811, 701.0812, 701.0813, 701.0814, 701.0815, 701.0816, 701.0817, 701.0818, 701.0819, subchapter IX (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.0901], 701.0901, 701.0902, 701.0903, subchapter X (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.1001], 701.1001, 701.1002, 701.1003, 701.1004, 701.1005, 701.1006, 701.1007, 701.1008, 701.1009, 701.1010, 701.1011, 701.1012, 701.1013, subchapter XI (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.1101], 701.1101, 701.1102 (intro.), 701.1102 (1g), 701.1106 (6), 701.1123 (1), 701.1123 (4), 701.1126 (title), 701.1134 (3) (c) and (d) and (4), subchapter XII (title) of chapter 701 [precedes 701.1201], 701.1202, 701.1203, 701.1205 (3), 702.02 (1), 702.02 (3), 702.05 (5), 702.17 (3) (b), 702.17 (6), 853.34 (3), 881.01 (1) (a) 1. and 2. and 881.01 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the laws of trusts, the Uniform Trust Code, the Uniform Principal and Income Act, powers of appointment, and changes to estate recovery and divestment provisions relating to public assistance programs. (FE)
Title
The laws of trusts, the Uniform Trust Code, the Uniform Principal and Income Act, powers of appointment, and changes to estate recovery and divestment provisions relating to public assistance programs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-12 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:11 PM on 11-14-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2013-11-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Sanfelippo and Wachs |
2013-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-11 | House | Representative Kahl added as a coauthor |
2013-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2013-11-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2013-11-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-11-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2013-11-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2013-11-05 | House | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2013-11-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-11-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab490 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB490.pdf |