WI AB49 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.507 (1) (h), 20.536 (1) (k), 24.61 (2) (c), 25.17 (1) (afp), 25.17 (1) (axp), 25.17 (1) (kd) and 25.17 (1) (xLc) of the statutes; Relating to: the authority of the Board of Commissioners of Public Lands to delegate authority to invest trust fund moneys and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
The authority of the Board of Commissioners of Public Lands to delegate authority to invest trust fund moneys and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 110 |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced |