WI AB49 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 175.35 (title), 175.35 (1) (ar), 175.35 (2) (d), 175.35 (2g) (c) 4. c. and 941.237 (1) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: waiting period for handgun purchases.
Title
Waiting period for handgun purchases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 7 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-04-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 offered by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-04-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representative Goyke |
2015-04-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Goyke |
2015-04-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Goyke |
2015-04-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Goyke |
2015-04-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goyke |
2015-04-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2015-02-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-19 | House | Representative Vorpagel added as a coauthor |
2015-02-18 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2015-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab49 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB49.pdf |