WI AB489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Received from Senate concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 238.15 (1) (L); and to create 238.15 (1) (Lg) of the statutes; Relating to: qualified new business venture eligibility. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualified new business venture eligibility. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-13SenateReport concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2018-02-13SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-19SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-01-10SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-10SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-01-10SenateExecutive action taken
2017-12-12SenatePublic hearing held
2017-11-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues
2017-11-09SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended
2017-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-09HouseRead a second time
2017-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-10-25HouseExecutive action taken
2017-10-18HousePublic hearing held
2017-09-25HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-09-13HouseRepresentative Subeck added as a coauthor
2017-09-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-09-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy
2017-09-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback