WI AB489 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 48.981 (2) (a) 15., 16. and 16m., 48.981 (2m), 48.981 (3) (c) 9., 48.981 (3m) (d), 48.981 (7) (a) 2r., 48.981 (7) (a) 10g., 48.981 (7) (a) 10j. and 48.981 (7) (a) 10r.; to renumber 48.981 (1) (ct), 48.981 (1) (cv), 48.981 (1) (cx), 48.981 (1) (i), 48.981 (2) (a) 17. to 29., 48.981 (3) (a) 2. a. to d., 48.981 (3) (b), 48.981 (3) (c) 2., 48.981 (3) (c) 2m., 48.981 (3) (c) 5., 48.981 (7) (a) 1., 48.981 (7) (a) 2., 48.981 (7) (a) 3., 48.981 (7) (a) 3m., 48.981 (7) (a) 4p., 48.981 (7) (a) 9., 48.981 (7) (a) 11r., 48.981 (7) (a) 12., 48.981 (7) (a) 14m., 48.981 (7) (a) 15g., 48.981 (7) (cr) 1. a. and b., 48.981 (7) (cr) 2. a. to f., 48.981 (7) (cr) 4. a. to d., 48.981 (7) (cr) 4. f. and g., 48.981 (7) (cr) 5. a. to d., 48.981 (7) (cr) 5. f., 48.981 (7) (cr) 6. a. to e. and 48.981 (7) (cr) 7. a. and b.; to renumber and amend 48.981 (1) (b), 48.981 (2) (a) (intro.) and 1. to 14., 48.981 (3) (a) 1., 48.981 (3) (a) 2. (intro.), 48.981 (3) (a) 2d., 48.981 (3) (a) 2g., 48.981 (3) (a) 3., 48.981 (3) (a) 4., 48.981 (3) (bm), 48.981 (3) (c) (title), 48.981 (3) (c) 1. a., 48.981 (3) (c) 1. b., 48.981 (3) (c) 3., 48.981 (3) (c) 4., 48.981 (3) (c) 5m., 48.981 (3) (c) 5p., 48.981 (3) (c) 5r., 48.981 (3) (c) 6., 48.981 (3) (c) 6m., 48.981 (3) (c) 7., 48.981 (3) (c) 8., 48.981 (3) (cm), 48.981 (3) (d), 48.981 (7) (a) (intro.), 48.981 (7) (a) 1m., 48.981 (7) (a) 2m., 48.981 (7) (a) 4., 48.981 (7) (a) 4m., 48.981 (7) (a) 5., 48.981 (7) (a) 6., 48.981 (7) (a) 6m., 48.981 (7) (a) 8., 48.981 (7) (a) 8m., 48.981 (7) (a) 8s., 48.981 (7) (a) 10., 48.981 (7) (a) 10m., 48.981 (7) (a) 11., 48.981 (7) (a) 11m., 48.981 (7) (a) 13., 48.981 (7) (a) 14., 48.981 (7) (a) 15., 48.981 (7) (a) 15m., 48.981 (7) (a) 17., 48.981 (7) (am), 48.981 (7) (b), 48.981 (7) (c), 48.981 (7) (cm), 48.981 (7) (cp), 48.981 (7) (cr) 1. (intro.), 48.981 (7) (cr) 2. (intro.), 48.981 (7) (cr) 3., 48.981 (7) (cr) 4. (intro.), 48.981 (7) (cr) 4. e., 48.981 (7) (cr) 5. (intro.), 48.981 (7) (cr) 5. e., 48.981 (7) (cr) 6. (intro.), 48.981 (7) (cr) 7. (intro.), 48.981 (7) (cr) 8., 48.981 (7) (cr) 9., 48.981 (7) (d), 48.981 (7) (dm), 48.981 (7) (e), 48.981 (7) (f) and 48.981 (10); to consolidate, renumber and amend 48.981 (2) (bm) 1. (intro.), a. and b. and 48.981 (2) (bm) 2. (intro.), a. and b.; to amend 48.236 (4) (a), 48.24 (5), 48.375 (4) (b) 1g., 48.375 (4) (b) 2., 48.685 (2) (am) 4., 48.685 (2) (b) 1. d., 48.685 (4m) (a) 4., 48.685 (4m) (b) 4., 48.981 (1) (ag), 48.981 (2) (b), 48.981 (2) (bm) 3., 48.981 (2) (c), 48.981 (2) (d), 48.981 (2r), 48.981 (3) (title), 48.981 (3m) (b) 1., 48.981 (3m) (c) (intro.), 48.981 (3m) (c) 1., 48.981 (3m) (c) 2. b., 48.981 (3m) (c) 3., 48.981 (5), 48.981 (8) (a), 48.981 (8) (b), 48.981 (8) (c), 48.981 (9) (b) 1., 48.981 (9) (b) 2., 48.983 (1) (b) 1. b., 48.983 (6) (b) 4., 50.065 (2) (am) 4., 50.065 (2) (b) 4., 50.065 (4m) (a) 4., 50.065 (4m) (b) 4., 51.30 (4) (b) 17., 118.07 (5), 146.82 (2) (a) 11. and 18m., 895.442 (1) (a), 895.442 (5), 905.06 (4) and 948.03 (6); and to create 48.981 (1) (bm), 48.981 (2) (ag), 48.981 (2) (ar) 16r., 30. and 31., 48.981 (2) (bm) (title), 48.981 (2) (bm) 1d., 48.981 (3d) (a) (title), 48.981 (3d) (b) (title), 48.981 (3d) (bm) (title), 48.981 (3d) (c) (title), 48.981 (3f) (title) and (a) (intro.), 48.981 (3g) (a) (title), 48.981 (3g) (b) (title), 48.981 (3g) (bm) (title), 48.981 (3g) (h) (title), 48.981 (3m) (a) (title), 48.981 (3m) (b) (title), 48.981 (7d) (intro.), 48.981 (7d) (a) (title), 48.981 (7d) (b) (title), 48.981 (7d) (c) (title), 48.981 (7d) (cm) (title), 48.981 (7d) (dp) (title), 48.981 (7d) (hm) (title), 48.981 (7d) (i) (title), 48.981 (7d) (Lr) (title), 48.981 (7d) (m) (title), 48.981 (7d) (om) (title), 48.981 (7d) (pg) (title), 48.981 (7g) (intro.), 48.981 (7m) (title), 48.981 (7r) (title) and 48.981 (8) (d) (title) of the statutes; Relating to: recodification of the child abuse and neglect reporting law; making probation agents, parole agents, and certain employees, contractors, and volunteers of schools and institutions of higher education mandated reporters of child abuse and neglect; training in child abuse and neglect identification, laws, and procedures and in human trafficking identification for certain employees, contractors, and volunteers of schools; eliminating an exception to the child abuse reporting requirement for providers of certain health care services when the suspected or threatened abuse consists of sexual intercourse or contact with a child; definitions of physical injury and neglect for purposes of mandated reporting of child abuse and neglect; and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Recodification of the child abuse and neglect reporting law; making probation agents, parole agents, and certain employees, contractors, and volunteers of schools and institutions of higher education mandated reporters of child abuse and neglect; training in child abuse and neglect identification, laws, and procedures and in human trafficking identification for certain employees, contractors, and volunteers of schools; eliminating an exception to the child abuse reporting requirement for providers of certain health care services when the suspected or threatened abuse consists of sexual intercourse or contact with a child; definitions of physical injury and neglect for purposes of mandated reporting of child abuse and neglect; and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Report passage as amended, Ayes 4, Noes 4 and without recommendation (Assembly Rule 19) by Committee on Family Law |
2016-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Subeck |
2016-01-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brandtjen |
2015-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-25 | House | Senator L. Taylor withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2015-11-25 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-11-11 | House | Representative Pope withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2015-11-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab489 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB489.pdf |