WI AB488 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.30 (3) (b); and to renumber and amend 118.30 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: access to pupil assessments that are required to be administered by school boards, operators of independent charter schools, and private schools participating in a parental choice program and repealing rules related to accessing pupil assessments.
Title
Access to pupil assessments that are required to be administered by school boards, operators of independent charter schools, and private schools participating in a parental choice program and repealing rules related to accessing pupil assessments.
Sponsors
Sen. John Jagler [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 335 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-27-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Senator Olsen added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-09-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-09-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-09-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2017-09-01 | House | Introduced |