WI AB481 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 341.307; to amend 25.40 (1) (a) 3. and 84.59 (2) (b); and to create 341.14 (3m) and 341.147 of the statutes; Relating to: motor vehicle fleet registration and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle fleet registration and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-26 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-02SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-11-02SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-10-27SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-10-26HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-10-26HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0
2021-10-26HouseRules suspended
2021-10-26HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-10-26HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2021-10-26HouseRead a second time
2021-10-21HousePlaced on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-10-20HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-10-20HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2021-10-20HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
2021-10-19HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
2021-10-19HouseExecutive action taken
2021-10-14HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2021-10-14HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2021-10-05HouseExecutive action taken
2021-09-09HouseRepresentative Knodl added as a coauthor
2021-09-01HouseRepresentative Plumer added as a coauthor
2021-08-31HousePublic hearing held
2021-08-31HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-07-26HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
2021-07-26HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback