WI AB481 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 48.546 and 938.546 of the statutes; Relating to: creating family treatment court and juvenile treatment court grant programs in the Department of Children and Families. (FE)
Title
Creating family treatment court and juvenile treatment court grant programs in the Department of Children and Families. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-16 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-12-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-11-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-05 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2017-10-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-04 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2017-09-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2017-08-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab481 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB481.pdf |