WI AB48 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.645 (1) (b) and 939.645 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: expanding the definition of hate crime victims to include law enforcement officers.
Title
Expanding the definition of hate crime victims to include law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-08-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-08-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 5 |
2017-08-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2017-06-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Crowley |
2017-06-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Goyke, Crowley and Kessler |
2017-06-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Crowley |
2017-06-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Crowley |
2017-06-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2017-04-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-06 | House | Representative Tranel added as a coauthor |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab48 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB48.pdf |