WI AB48 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 341.14 (6r) (b) 9.; to amend 341.14 (6r) (d) 1. and 341.14 (6r) (fm) 7.; and to create 341.08 (2) (f), 341.14 (6m) (d), 341.14 (6r) (b) 9. b., 341.14 (6r) (d) 3. and 341.14 (6r) (f) 49p. of the statutes; relating to: special distinguishing registration plates for groups that are military in nature and making an appropriation.
Title
Special distinguishing registration plates for groups that are military in nature and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. Alan Lasee [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Marlin Schneider [D] |
Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] | Rep. John Townsend [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:02 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-16 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Executive action taken | |
2009-12-03 | Public hearing held | |
2009-12-02 | Representative Steinbrink added as a coauthor | |
2009-03-12 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab48 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB48.pdf |