WI AB478 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 995.225 (1) (intro.) of the statutes; relating to: changing the date of fire prevention week from the week of October 8 to the week of October 9.
Title
Changing the date of fire prevention week from the week of October 8 to the week of October 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:15 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-22 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Public Health and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2012-02-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-01 | House | Representative Clark added as a coauthor |
2012-01-31 | House | Senator S. Fitzgerald added as a cosponsor |
2012-01-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health and Public Safety |
2012-01-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab478 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB478.pdf |