WI AB475 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 67.05 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: including with a referendum question for issuing bonds a statement of the estimated interest accruing on the amount of the bonds.
Title
Including with a referendum question for issuing bonds a statement of the estimated interest accruing on the amount of the bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 4, Noes 2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-08 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-10-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-07-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced |