WI AB471 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.983 (1) (a), 29.983 (1) (b) 9., 29.983 (1) (b) 10., 29.983 (1) (b) 11. and 29.983 (1) (b) 12.; and to create 29.983 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: wild animal protection surcharges for game fish and a higher wild animal protection surcharge for certain animals of a larger size. (FE)
Title
Wild animal protection surcharges for game fish and a higher wild animal protection surcharge for certain animals of a larger size. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-12-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-12-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-11-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-02 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2015-10-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2015-10-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab471 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB471.pdf |