WI AB470 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 196.485 (1) (cr), 196.485 (1) (ef) and 196.485 (3g) of the statutes; Relating to: an incumbent transmission facility owner's right to construct, own, and maintain certain transmission facilities and Public Service Commission procedures if the transmission facility is a regionally cost-shared transmission line.
Title
An incumbent transmission facility owner's right to construct, own, and maintain certain transmission facilities and Public Service Commission procedures if the transmission facility is a regionally cost-shared transmission line.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-14 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2023-11-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2023-10-11 | House | Representative Plumer withdrawn as a coauthor |
2023-10-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2023-10-05 | House | Introduced |