WI AB47 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 985.01 (1b) (a); to consolidate, renumber and amend 985.01 (1b) (intro.) and (b); and to amend 985.01 (3r), 985.02 (3), 985.03 (1) (a) 1m., 985.03 (1) (am) 1. and 985.08 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: qualification of newspapers to receive compensation for publication of legal notices and requirements relating to publication.
Title
Qualification of newspapers to receive compensation for publication of legal notices and requirements relating to publication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-11 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2021-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced |