WI AB47 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 33.28 (2) (intro.), 33.28 (2) (a) and 33.28 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: membership of boards of commissioners established for public inland lake protection and rehabilitation districts. (FE)
Title
Membership of boards of commissioners established for public inland lake protection and rehabilitation districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 25 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-18-2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-01 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2015-04-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |