WI AB469 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.315 of the statutes; Relating to: use of changing rooms by pupils. (FE)
Title
Use of changing rooms by pupils. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Knudson |
2015-12-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer |
2015-11-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-18 | House | Representative Heaton added as a coauthor |
2015-11-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer |
2015-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-10-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab469 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB469.pdf |