WI AB467 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: establishing a task force to study the legal and societal barriers to equality for transgender, intersex, nonbinary, and gender nonconforming individuals. (FE)
Title
Establishing a task force to study the legal and societal barriers to equality for transgender, intersex, nonbinary, and gender nonconforming individuals. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Assembly Organization |
2021-07-13 | House | Introduced |