WI AB467 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 285.60 (3m) and 285.63 (3m) of the statutes; relating to: consideration of certain greenhouse gas emissions in determining requirements applicable to a stationary source of air pollution. (FE)
Title
Consideration of certain greenhouse gas emissions in determining requirements applicable to a stationary source of air pollution. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - Assembly: Senate amendment 1 concurred in (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | House | Published 4-16-2012 |
2012-04-03 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 171 |
2012-03-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2012 |
2012-03-01 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-02-21 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Senate amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 90, Noes 5 |
2012-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2012-01-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2012-01-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-26 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2012-01-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-01-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-01-26 | House | Read a second time |
2012-01-24 | House | Placed on calendar 1-26-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2012-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-01-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-01-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-11 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2012-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2012-01-09 | House | Introduced |