WI AB466 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 134.985 of the statutes; Relating to: consumer data protection and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Consumer data protection and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Representatives Cabrera, Drake and Krug added as coauthors |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-11-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-11-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-11-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2023-10-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-10 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2023-10-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2023-10-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2023-10-05 | House | Introduced |