WI AB466 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 23.41 (6) and 25.185 (2); to amend 16.75 (3m) (b) 2., 16.75 (3m) (c) 5. a., 16.855 (10m) (am) 2., 16.87 (2) (c), 18.16 (2) (b), 18.16 (3) (b), 18.16 (4) (b), 18.16 (5) (b), 18.64 (2) (b), 18.64 (3) (b), 18.64 (4) (b), 18.64 (5) (b), 18.77 (2) (b), 18.77 (3) (b), 18.77 (4) (b), 18.77 (5) (b), 84.075 (1m) (b), 200.57 (3), 229.46 (2) (intro.), 229.46 (3) (intro.), 229.70 (2), 229.70 (3) (intro.), 229.70 (4), 229.8273 (2), 229.8273 (3) and 229.845 (2); and to create 23.41 (6) (b) and 25.185 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: state procurement and construction contracts with disabled veteran-owned businesses. (FE)
Title
State procurement and construction contracts with disabled veteran-owned businesses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2013-12-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-07 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2013-11-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-11-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans |
2013-10-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab466 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB466.pdf |