WI AB466 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 48. of the statutes; relating to: creating an individual income tax deduction for certain contributions to a Coverdell Education Savings Account. (FE)
Title
Creating an individual income tax deduction for certain contributions to a Coverdell Education Savings Account. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-27 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 1 |
2012-02-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2012-02-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-02-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2012-01-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means |
2012-01-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab466 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB466.pdf |