WI AB464 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.14 (3) (b); to amend 118.14 (1) (a), 118.14 (3) (a), 121.004 (7) (c) 1. (intro.) and 121.004 (7) (cm); and to create 118.14 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the age at which a child may attend four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Title
The age at which a child may attend four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Representative Tusler withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-10-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab464 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB464.pdf |