WI AB464 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 29.088 (2m); and to create 29.088 (2m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the maximum height of pole traps.
Title
The maximum height of pole traps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 169 |
2018-03-27 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-27-2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2018 |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-09-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-08-10 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2017-08-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-08-07 | House | Introduced |