WI AB464 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 813.122 (5m) (am), 813.122 (5m) (aw), 813.122 (5m) (b) and (c), 813.125 (4m) (cm), 813.125 (4m) (cw) and 813.125 (4m) (d) and (e); to renumber 813.122 (2); to renumber and amend 813.12 (4m) (am), 813.12 (4m) (aw), 813.12 (4m) (b) and 813.12 (4m) (c); to amend 48.25 (6), 813.12 (4m) (a) 1., 813.12 (4m) (a) 2., 813.122 (5m) (a) 1., 813.122 (5m) (a) 2., 813.125 (4) (a) 2., 813.125 (4m) (c) 1., 813.125 (4m) (c) 2., 813.125 (6) (c) and 938.25 (6); and to create 785.01 (1) (bp) and (br), 813.12 (2) (c), 813.122 (2) (b), 813.125 (4) (a) 2. a., b. and c. and 813.1285 of the statutes; Relating to: providing notice of firearm prohibition when serving notice for certain injunction hearings and process for surrendering firearms following the granting of certain injunctions. (FE)
Title
Providing notice of firearm prohibition when serving notice for certain injunction hearings and process for surrendering firearms following the granting of certain injunctions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 321 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-31-2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senator Ellis added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2014-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2013-12-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-12-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies |
2013-11-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-11-19 | House | LRB correction |
2013-11-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2013-10-25 | House | Introduced |