WI AB46 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 238.142 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to certain small businesses that receive federal grants. (FE)
Title
Grants to certain small businesses that receive federal grants. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-07-25 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kolste |
2017-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Small Business Development |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab46 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB46.pdf |