WI AB456 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Published 2-25-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Published 2-25-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 909.02 (4) of the statutes; relating to: self-authentication by electronic certification of certain Department of Transportation records.
Title
Self-authentication by electronic certification of certain Department of Transportation records.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. James Soletski [D] | Rep. John Steinbrink [D] |
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Published 2-25-2010 | |
2010-02-11 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-11-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 118 | |
2010-02-09 | Presented to the Governor on 2-9-2010 | |
2010-02-01 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-01-28 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-28 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-01-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-28 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on calendar 1-28-2010 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2010-01-20 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-01-20 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-20 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-11-04 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-03 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-11-03 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-03 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on calendar 11-3-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-27 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-27 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-22 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-08 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2009-09-30 | Introduced |