WI AB453 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 146.816 of the statutes; Relating to: uses and disclosures of protected health information. (FE)
Title
Uses and disclosures of protected health information. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 238 |
2014-04-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-29-2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-22-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Erpenbach withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and rereferred to committee on Health and Human Services pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Senator Lassa withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2013-11-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2013-10-18 | House | Introduced |