WI AB451 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 813.1283 of the statutes; Relating to: the Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Domestic Violence Protection Orders Act and providing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Domestic Violence Protection Orders Act and providing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HousePublished 3-29-2018
2018-03-28HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 181
2018-03-27HousePresented to the Governor on 3-27-2018
2018-02-26HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-26-2018
2018-02-26HouseLRB correction
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-16SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-11-14SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-11-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2017-11-09SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-09HouseRepresentatives Barca and Shankland added as coauthors
2017-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended
2017-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-09HouseRead a second time
2017-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-11-07HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-11-07HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2017-11-07HouseExecutive action taken
2017-10-31HousePublic hearing held
2017-07-26HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Family Law
2017-07-26HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback