WI AB45 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 551.508 (1m) (a) and (c), 551.603 (4) (a) and (c) and 551.604 (4); and to create 551.102 (33) and 551.413 of the statutes; Relating to: financial exploitation of vulnerable adults with securities accounts, violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial exploitation of vulnerable adults with securities accounts, violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-25HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 1
2021-03-25HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 6
2021-03-10HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-10HouseRepresentative Stubbs added as a coauthor
2021-03-03HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2021-02-24HousePublic hearing held
2021-02-23HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Macco
2021-02-11HouseRepresentative James added as a coauthor
2021-02-10HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback