WI AB449 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.471 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: BadgerCare Plus and assistance for childless adults demonstration project purchase options. (FE)
Title
BadgerCare Plus and assistance for childless adults demonstration project purchase options. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Representative Young added as a coauthor |
2018-01-17 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2018-01-02 | House | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-27 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2017-12-07 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor |
2017-12-05 | House | Representatives Hesselbein and Doyle added as coauthors |
2017-07-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-07-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab449 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB449.pdf |