WI AB448 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 978.045 (1g); and to amend 175.47 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: prosecution decisions following deaths involving law enforcement officers. (FE)
Title
Prosecution decisions following deaths involving law enforcement officers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-07-12 | House | Introduced |