WI AB446 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 115.38 (1) (a) and 121.02 (1) (c) 3.; to repeal and recreate 118.016; and to create 119.44 (2) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: reading readiness assessments and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Reading readiness assessments and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-08 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-11-2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3) |
2022-03-11 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2022-03-11 | House | LRB correction |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Taken from the table |
2022-01-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to calendar of 10-26-2021 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2021-10-21 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2021-10-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-20 | House | LRB correction |
2021-10-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2021-09-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-16 | House | Representative Summerfield added as a coauthor |
2021-07-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-07-12 | House | Introduced |