WI AB44 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 60.555, 118.07 (4) (bm) 2. and 118.07 (4) (c); and to create 101.14 (1) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: installation of a barricade device on an interior door in a school building. (FE)
Title
Installation of a barricade device on an interior door in a school building. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-08-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-08-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-04-04 | House | Representative Jagler withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-03-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-05 | House | Representative Zimmerman added as a coauthor |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab44 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB44.pdf |