WI AB44 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 3.002 (2); to consolidate, renumber and amend 3.002 (intro.) and (1m); to amend 3.004 (2) and 5.15 (4) (a); to repeal and recreate subchapter I of chapter 4 [precedes 4.001]; and to create 13.49 of the statutes; Relating to: legislative and congressional redistricting. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative and congressional redistricting. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-22HouseRefused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Campaigns and Elections and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59
2017-04-03HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-02-20HouseRepresentative Hintz added as a coauthor
2017-01-31HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2017-01-31HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback