WI AB44 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 29.179 (title), 29.179 (2) and 29.179 (4); and to create 29.179 (1) (am), 29.179 (1) (c) and 29.179 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: transfer of certain fish and game approvals to persons with disabilities and the transfer of Class A bear licenses to persons awarded the Purple Heart or serving on active duty in the U.S. armed forces. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer of certain fish and game approvals to persons with disabilities and the transfer of Class A bear licenses to persons awarded the Purple Heart or serving on active duty in the U.S. armed forces. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2015-10-15HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2015-10-15HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2015-10-14HouseExecutive action taken
2015-05-27HousePublic hearing held
2015-02-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2015-02-17HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
2015-02-17HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback